Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Health Care Facilities - Employees - Alternative Workweeks
Sponsored by
Delegate Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (130-1)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of Health to authorize an employee of a State facility to work according to an "alternative workweek", which means a work schedule under which a certain employee may work less than 40 hours in a week; requiring that a certain employee be considered a full-time employee of the State; providing that certain provisions of law governing the payment for overtime work do not apply to employees of a State facility who are authorized to work according to a certain alternative workweek; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0542
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 2 of the bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Health Care Facilities - Employees - Alternative Workweeks
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {186085/1 Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Health Care Facilities - Employees - Alternative Workweeks
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-1)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Health Care Facilities - Employees - Alternative Workweeks
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Favorable with Amendments {186085/1 Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Health Care Facilities - Employees - Alternative Workweeks
House 3/05/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (130-1) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/8/2021 2:16 PM
Click to return on the top page