Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Recreational Hunting or Fishing License Applications - Disclosure of Information
Sponsored by
Delegate Glass
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that the Department of Natural Resources may require an applicant to provide only specified information on an application for a recreational hunting or fishing license; altering the information that a request for information from a recreational hunting or fishing license application made by the Child Support Enforcement Administration of the Department of Human Resources to the Department of Natural Resources is required to contain; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0514 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2014 2/03/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/03/2014 2/03/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-119.3 )
(   10-301, 4-202, 4-205, 4-604 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM