Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts
Sponsored by
Delegate Branch
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "mechanical repair contract"; authorizing an agent and a registered obligor under a mechanical repair contract to offer, sell, or negotiate a mechanical repair contract; establishing that an obligor or a vehicle dealer is liable for the actions of its agent under specified circumstances; requiring an obligor or a licensed vehicle dealer that uses an agent to sell a mechanical repair contract to maintain a specified list and, on request, make the list available to the Insurance Commissioner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0414
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Reassigned to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {733592/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Reassigned to Economic Matters
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Favorable with Amendments {733592/1 Report Adopted 45
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 46
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 4/01/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 58
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-311.2, 27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM