Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Operation of Uninsured Motor Vehicle - Criminal Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Wells, Acevero, Anderson, Bagnall, D. Barnes, Barron, Bartlett, Boyce, Bridges, Cain, Charkoudian, Charles, Conaway, Cullison, Feldmark, Fennell, Gaines, Gilchrist, Ivey, Kerr, Korman, Lehman, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lopez, Love, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, Mosby, Pena-Melnyk, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Stewart, Terrasa, Washington, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the term of imprisonment that may be imposed on a person who operates or knowingly allows to be operated a motor vehicle that the person knows or has reason to know is not covered by the required security; and reducing from $1,000 to $500 the maximum fine that may be imposed on a person for a first offense for operating or knowingly allowing to be operated a motor vehicle that the person knows or has reason to know is not covered by the required security.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Operation of Uninsured Motor Vehicle - Criminal Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Operation of Uninsured Motor Vehicle - Criminal Penalties
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM