Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Nuisances in Multidwelling Buildings - Private Right of Action MC 10-13
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that an individual who resides in Montgomery County and has been harmed by a specified type of nuisance may bring an action to abate the nuisance or for other compensatory or equitable relief against the person found to have created the nuisance; and altering the definition of "nuisance", in Montgomery County only, to include tobacco smoke that drifts from specified units into a specified residential dwelling unit in a multidwelling building more than once in a consecutive 14-day period.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-301, 20-305.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM