Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education Investment Tax Credit Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Glenn
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Higher Education Investment Tax Credit Program to authorize tax credits against the State income tax, public service company franchise tax, and insurance premium tax equal to 50% of the donation made to specified eligible higher education institutions; requiring the donations to be used for specified purposes in priority funding areas; authorizing, each year, the Maryland Higher Education Commission to allocate up to $20,000,000 in tax credits to eligible higher education institutions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0002
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-101, 1-101, 17-401 through 17-406 )
(   6-123 )
(   10-737, 8-418 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM