Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Condominiums - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions of Governing Documents
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Making unenforceable a provision of declaration, a bylaw, a contract for the initial sale of a unit, or any other instrument made by a developer or vendor in accordance with specified provisions of law under specified circumstances; and applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0670
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1170 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {420718/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Condominiums - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions of Governing Documents
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments {420718/1 Adopted 57
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Text - Third - Condominiums - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions of Governing Documents
House 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 58
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Referred Rules 54
Senate 3/29/2017 3/30/2017 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-134.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM