Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - DNA Samples and Records - Collection, Use, Storage, and Expungement
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Braveboy, Hough, Oaks, and Swain
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a governmental unit that collects DNA samples or maintains DNA records for law enforcement purposes to comply with specified provisions of law governing the collection, use, and expungement of DNA samples and records; and prohibiting a DNA sample from being stored unless it is required to be collected or stored under specified provisions of law.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1523 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-502.1, 2-505 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM