Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures
Sponsored by
Delegates Healey, Barron, Gaines, C. Howard, J. Lewis, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that a certain dispute settlement mechanism does not apply to complaints or demands arising out of a cooperative housing member's failure to pay certain assessments owed to the cooperative housing corporation; repealing a requirement that the governing body of a cooperative housing corporation hold a hearing on a certain alleged violation under certain circumstances; authorizing a member to request a hearing on a certain alleged violation within a certain time frame; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0021
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   5-6B-30, 5-6B-31 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page