Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Renters Tax Credit Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Carter
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of the amount of property tax relief provided to specified renters by increasing, from 15% to 25%, the percent of rent used to calculate the assumed property tax; altering the calculation of combined income of a renter to increase the amount of property tax relief available; increasing, from $750 to $1,500, the maximum amount of property tax relief that may be provided under the program; requiring the Department of Assessments and Taxation to establish a marketing campaign; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0354
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
1/31/2014 Text - First - Maryland Renters Tax Credit Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM