Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Beitzel, Barve, Brooks, Buckel, Carr, Chang, Cullison, Ebersole, Glass, Hettleman, Hill, S. Howard, Jalisi, Kipke, Krimm, McKay, McMillan, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, S. Robinson, Shoemaker, Sophocleus, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "school vehicle"; establishing that a school vehicle includes specified vehicles that meet or comply with specified standards and requirements, were originally used to transport children, students, and teachers in another state, and are used only for transporting children to and from a Head Start program.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0133 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-6)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 46
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Second Reading Passed 46
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (129-6) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 48A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-154, 11-173, 11-174 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM