Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Ready, Afzali, Boteler, Dwyer, Elliott, Frank, Glass, Hershey, Jacobs, Kipke, Krebs, McDermott, O'Donnell, Otto, Parrott, Rosenberg, Schuh, Schulz, Smigiel, Stocksdale, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State or a local jurisdiction from imposing or levying a vehicle-miles-traveled tax or specified other similar fees, tolls, or taxes; and prohibiting the State or a local jurisdiction from requiring the installation of a device in or on a privately owned vehicle to facilitate the reporting of the number of vehicle-miles traveled.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM