Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement
Sponsored by
Delegates Waldstreicher, Anderson, and Vallario
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which the Motor Vehicle Administration is required to expunge the driving record or a probation before judgment of an individual; repealing a specified requirement that licensees apply for an expungement of specified driving records before the Administration may expunge them; prohibiting the Administration from expunging specified drug- and alcohol-related driving offenses and offenses relating to failing to remain at the scene of specified accidents; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0545
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters and Judiciary
House 2/03/2014 2/03/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-117.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM