Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Municipalities - Charter Amendments - Referendum and Signatures Required for Petitions
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, B. Barnes, Carr, Frush, Gaines, Tarlau, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the legislative body of a municipality to adopt a charter amendment that authorizes the legislative body of the municipality to submit to the qualified voters of the municipality at a regular or special municipal election a proposed charter amendment; lowering from 20% to a percentage no lower than 5% the required percentage of qualified voters of the municipality necessary to petition a proposed charter amendment to a referendum or to initiate a proposed charter amendment; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2015 4/01/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-304, 4-305, 4-306.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM