Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Guardianship and Child in Need of Assistance Proceedings - Jurisdiction and Authority of Juvenile Court
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Anderson, Atterbeary, Bromwell, Carter, Conaway, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Jalisi, Lierman, Luedtke, Morales, Sanchez, Smith, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the juvenile court to direct the provision of specified services to a specified child during a specified disposition hearing; requiring the juvenile court to direct the provision of specified services to a specified child during a permanency planning hearing or guardianship hearing; providing that, if the juvenile court enters an order directing the provision of specified services to a specified child, the juvenile court retains jurisdiction for a specified period of time and for specified purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0448
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {292815/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Special Order until next session (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Special Order until 4/11 (Delegate Dumais) Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {292815/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Special Order until next session (Delegate Buckel) Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Special Order until 4/11 (Delegate Dumais) Adopted 67
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-801, 3-804, 3-819, 3-823 )
(   5-324, 5-328 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM