Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - Codified
Sponsored by
Delegates Hammen, Anderson, Branch, Busch, Carey, Carter, Clippinger, Conaway, Glenn, Hayes, Haynes, Lafferty, Lierman, Lisanti, McCray, McIntosh, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Smith, Sophocleus, M. Washington, West, and P. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 29
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program to provide investment in local housing and businesses focusing on areas where modest investment will have an appreciable impact; providing that community enhancement projects may be located in more than one political subdivision; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to issue a request for community enhancement project proposals; requiring the Governor to include a $12,000,000 appropriation to the fund for fiscal years 2018 through 2022; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0558
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {514560/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {833624/1 Rejected (51-88)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kittleman) {933023/1 Rejected (49-89)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-45)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {399638/1
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/30 (Senator McFadden) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {399638/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator McFadden) {843329/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (31-14)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-44)
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 29
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/19 at 12:30 p.m.
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {514560/1 Report Adopted 35
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 35
House 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {833624/1 Rejected (51-88) 37
House 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Kittleman) {933023/1 Rejected (49-89) 37
House 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (92-45) 40
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 40
Senate 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {399638/1 53
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Special Order until 3/30 (Senator McFadden) Adopted 53
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments {399638/1 Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator McFadden) {843329/1 Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (31-14) 56
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 58A
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (91-44) 58A
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Passed Enrolled 58A
Post Passage 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 29
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-501 through 6-510 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM