Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Professional Land Surveyors - Surveying Practice - Definition and Licensing Exception
Sponsored by
Delegate Valderrama
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "practice land surveying" for purposes of certain provisions of law governing professional land surveyors; and exempting certain individuals who utilize measurement devices or systems, regardless of the technology or methods used, for the exclusive purpose of determining topography and contours and are certified by certain entities approved by the State Board for Professional Land Surveyors from certain licensing requirements.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2021
Legislative Date
1/28/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Professional Land Surveyors - Surveying Practice - Definition and Licensing Exception
House 1/28/2021 1/28/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Professional Land Surveyors - Surveying Practice - Definition and Licensing Exception
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/25/2021 3:34 PM
Click to return on the top page