Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Grace Period for Failure to Appear
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a defendant who fails to appear for a scheduled court hearing from being penalized if he or she turns himself or herself in to the court within 7 days of the missed hearing and if he or she was not arrested or charged with another crime after failure to appear; authorizing a court to order a certain defendant to pay certain fees and costs; and applying the Act.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Grace Period for Failure to Appear
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page