Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Strategic Demolition and Smart Growth Impact Fund - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Hammen, Anderson, Branch, Busch, Carey, Carter, Clippinger, Conaway, Glenn, Hayes, Haynes, Lafferty, Lierman, Lisanti, McCray, McIntosh, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Smith, Sophocleus, Walker, M. Washington, West, and P. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 30
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Establishing the Strategic Demolition and Smart Growth Impact Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund is to provide grants and loans to assist in predevelopment activities, including demolition, land assembly, architecture and engineering, and site development for revitalization projects in an area designated as a sustainable community; requiring the Governor to include an appropriation to the Fund in fiscal year 2018 of $25,625,000 to be allocated to projects in Baltimore City and throughout the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0559
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Committee Amendment {964666/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Substitute Committee Amendment {654265/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (112-27)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/30 (Senator McFadden) Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {823021/1 Rejected (15-30)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-5)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 30
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/19 at 12:30 p.m.
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2016 2/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Committee Amendment {964666/1 Withdrawn 28
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Substitute Committee Amendment {654265/1 Adopted 28
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 28
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (112-27) 30
Senate 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 30
Senate 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable 53
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 53
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Special Order until 3/30 (Senator McFadden) Adopted 54
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {823021/1 Rejected (15-30) 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed (41-5) 56
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Returned Passed 58A
Post Passage 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 30
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM