Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Court Officials - Public Disclosure of Personal Information
Sponsored by
Delegate McComas
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain judges and prosecutors and certain immediate family members to make a written request that certain personal information be removed from the Internet or from certain other publications; requiring a person who receives a request under the Act to remove the information within 72 hours; authorizing certain civil actions for violations of the Act; prohibiting the inspection without permission of public records containing certain personal information about certain current and former judges and prosecutors; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Court Officials - Public Disclosure of Personal Information
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2021
Legislative Date
1/31/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Court Officials - Public Disclosure of Personal Information
House 1/31/2021 1/31/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing canceled
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:45 PM
Click to return on the top page