Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Personal Assistive Mobility Device - Definition
Sponsored by
Delegate Lam
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "electric personal assistive mobility device" to require that the device have a specified steering mechanism and a specified platform on which the rider stands.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 40
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed 40
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 43
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 43
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-101, 21-1201, 21-501.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM