Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Eligibility - Cost-of-Living Adjustment
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Angel, D. Barnes, Krimm, Pena-Melnyk, Sanchez, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering, for purposes of determining eligibility for the homeowners' property tax credit, a specified limitation on a homeowner's combined gross income amount for credits granted for taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018, based on a specified cost-of-living adjustment percentage; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0407
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Eligibility - Cost-of-Living Adjustment
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM