Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Fund - Donor Registry - Annual Funding
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Kelly, Sample-Hughes, Tarlau, Valentino-Smith, K. Young, and Hill
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health to distribute at least $400,000 annually from the Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Fund to the qualified nonprofit organization responsible for the maintenance and operation of a certain donor registry; requiring that any unused funds distributed to a certain qualified nonprofit entity revert to the Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Fund at the end of each fiscal year; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {276289/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-4)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Fund - Donor Registry - Annual Funding
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments {276289/1 Adopted 41
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Fund - Donor Registry - Annual Funding
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-4) 42
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Finance 43
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Text - Chapter - Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Fund - Donor Registry - Annual Funding
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM