Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
College Savings Plans of Maryland - Maryland College Savings Account Plan - Authorization
Sponsored by
Delegates Frick, A. Washington, Afzali, Barkley, Bromwell, Chang, Conaway, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Lam, McDonough, Platt, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, C. Wilson, K. Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the College Savings Plans of Maryland Board to establish the Maryland College Savings Account Plan for specified purposes; requiring the Board to oversee the administration of the Savings Account Plan; requiring the Board to maintain the Savings Account Plan in compliance with specified standards for qualified tuition programs; requiring the Board to adopt specified procedures; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-1901, 18-1902.1, 18-1904, 18-1905, 18-19A-05, 18-19B-05, 18-19C-01 through 18-19C-08 )
(   10-205, 10-207, 10-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM