Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Investigations and Subpoenas - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, Hill, S. Howard, McDonough, Morgan, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, and West
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a body of a decedent may be transported for preparation or storage to a facility that is not within the jurisdiction of the State, licensed by the State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors, or permitted by the Office of Cemetery Oversight; requiring the Board to develop specified checklists and to post the templates for specified checklists on the Board's Web site; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0642
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Investigations and Subpoenas - Revisions
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-205, 7-310, 7-319, 7-409 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM