Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Education Aid - Tax Increment Financing Development Districts - Repeal of Sunset Provision
Sponsored by
Delegates McIntosh, Ali, Anderson, Barkley, Branch, Conaway, Frush, Gaines, Gibson, Glenn, Hayes, Haynes, Healey, C. Howard, Jones, Kaiser, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, McCray, Mosby, Reznik, Rosenberg, Sophocleus, M. Washington, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the termination provision of a certain provision of law relating to the annual certification of the amount of assessable base for certain real property for the purposes of calculating certain State education aid.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0612
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-3)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Education Aid - Tax Increment Financing Development Districts - Repeal of Sunset Provision
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - State Education Aid - Tax Increment Financing Development Districts - Repeal of Sunset Provision
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-3) 37
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 38
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Text - Chapter - State Education Aid - Tax Increment Financing Development Districts - Repeal of Sunset Provision
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM