Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
**Veto override
   HB0694 - 2017RS
   CH0002 - 2018RS
Title
Higher Education - Admissions Process - Criminal History (Maryland Fair Access to Education Act of 2017)
Sponsored by
Delegates McIntosh and Barron
Status
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 2 of 2018
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified institutions of higher education from using information about the criminal history of applicants on specified admissions applications; allowing an institution of higher education to use a third-party admissions application that contains questions about the criminal history of the applicant under specified conditions; prohibiting an institution of higher education from automatically or unreasonably restricting a student's admission based on that student's criminal history; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0543
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): December 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {704962/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-45)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {954738/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-9)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-45)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/11 (Delegate Frick) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2018
Legislative Date
1/11/2018
Action
Overridden (90-50)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Overridden (32-15)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/15 (Senator Reilly) Rejected
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Became Law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 2 of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education - Admissions Process - Criminal History (Maryland Fair Access to Education Act of 2017)
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {704962/1 Adopted 48
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Higher Education - Admissions Process - Criminal History (Maryland Fair Access to Education Act of 2017)
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (94-45) 49
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {954738/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (37-9) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (93-45) 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Higher Education - Admissions Process - Criminal History (Maryland Fair Access to Education Act of 2017)
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/11 (Delegate Frick) Adopted
House 1/11/2018 1/11/2018 Overridden (90-50)
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Overridden (32-15)
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/15 (Senator Reilly) Rejected
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Motion Special Order vote on veto until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Post Passage 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Became Law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 2 of 2018
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Admissions Process - Criminal History (Maryland Fair Access to Education Act of 2017)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   26-501 through 26-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM