Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Obstructing Justice - Tampering With or Fabricating Physical Evidence
Sponsored by
Delegates McComas, Clippinger, Cluster, Dumais, Dwyer, Elliott, Glass, K. Kelly, Krebs, McDermott, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, Swain, Valentino-Smith, and Wood
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from destroying, altering, concealing, or removing physical evidence that the person believes may be used in a pending or future official proceeding with the intent to impair the verity or availability of the physical evidence, or from fabricating physical evidence with the intent to deceive in order to impair the verity of the physical evidence, with the intent that the fabricated physical evidence be introduced in a pending or future official proceeding; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {578177/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-1)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Second Reading Passed 46
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {578177/2 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-1) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 69
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-301, 9-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM