Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Authorized Prescribers - Reporting of Financial Gratuities or Incentives
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Acevero, Beitzel, Healey, Hettleman, Kaiser, Kipke, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lierman, McIntosh, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Terrasa, Valderrama, C. Watson, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each authorized prescriber who receives a financial gratuity or incentive from a pharmaceutical distributor or manufacturer to file a certain disclosure form with the Maryland Health Care Commission within 30 days of the receipt of the financial gratuity or incentive; authorizing the Commission to impose a certain fine under certain circumstances; requiring the Commission to adopt certain regulations; defining certain terms; and providing for the application of the Act.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0430
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Health Care Commission - Authorized Prescribers - Reporting of Financial Gratuities or Incentives
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM