Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Maryland Mediation Confidentiality Act - Applicability
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the scope of the Maryland Mediation Confidentiality Act; and authorizing a specified agreement to exclude specified mediation communications from the application of the Maryland Mediation Confidentiality Act.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0409
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {662910/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2013 2/04/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Favorable with Amendments {662910/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 50
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 50
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM