Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Special Education Ombudsman
Sponsored by
Delegates Washington and Ivey
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Special Education Ombudsman in the Office of the Attorney General to serve as a resource to provide information and support to parents, students, and educators regarding special education rights and services; requiring the Attorney General, and the Secretary of Budget and Management, to set the salary and qualifications for the Ombudsman; requiring the Ombudsman to submit a report with recommendations concerning the State's special education services by July 1, 2022, and each July 1 thereafter; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0504
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Office of the Attorney General - Special Education Ombudsman
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Office of the Attorney General - Special Education Ombudsman
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-501 through 6-506 )
Last Updated: 2/17/2020 9:20 AM