Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Child Kidnapping for the Purpose of Committing a Sexual Crime - Penalty
Sponsored by
Delegates Lee, Beidle, Bobo, Cardin, Carr, Cullison, DeBoy, Dumais, Dwyer, Frush, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Haddaway-Riccio, Healey, Howard, Jameson, Jones, A. Kelly, Lafferty, McComas, McDonough, A. Miller, Morhaim, Ready, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, F. Turner, Valderrama, and A. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the elements of a specified prohibition involving persuading or enticing from a specified place or knowingly secreting or harboring an individual under the age of 16 years for purposes of prostitution or committing a specified sexual crime so as to prohibit the act of persuading or enticing from a specified place and knowingly secreting or harboring the individual for the purpose of committing a specified sexual crime; reclassifying the offense as a felony and increasing the penalty for violation of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0454
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {492611/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {898471/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Delegates Simmons, Swain, and Parrott
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Senators Zirkin, Brochin, and Shank
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
65B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
65B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65B
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments {492611/1 Report Adopted 48A
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments {898471/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 60
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 House Requests Senate Recede 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Delegates Simmons, Swain, and Parrott 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Senate Refuses to Recede 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Senators Zirkin, Brochin, and Shank 62
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Conference Committee Report Adopted 70
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 70
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Conference Committee Report Adopted 65B
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 65B
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Passed Enrolled 65B
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM