Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and Processing
Sponsored by
Delegate Feldman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "electronic transmission", for purposes of provisions of law governing business entities, to clarify that it includes electronic mail, facsimile transmission, and Internet transmission; clarifying the authority of the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to accept documents that are filed for record by electronic transmission; authorizing the Department to accept documents or drafts of documents for review of sufficiency before the documents are filed with the Department; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0622
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {873296/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2013 2/04/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {873296/1 Report Adopted 36
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
House 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 38
Senate 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 37
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 1-201, 1-203, 1-203.2, 1-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM