Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Programs to Improve Employee to Supervisor or Manager Ratios
Sponsored by
Delegates Jones, Frick, Anderson, Chang, Glenn, Gutierrez, Haynes, Platt, Proctor, Sophocleus, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management, the Secretary of Transportation, and the governing boards of State institutions of higher education to establish a program to improve the ratio of State employees to supervisors or managers beginning on specified dates; specifying the goals for establishing reasonable ratios of State employees to supervisors or managers; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0657
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-111, 14-104, 14-408, 16-510 )
(   2-103.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM