Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Identity Protection and Credit Monitoring Services (Student Identity Protection Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Vogt, Angel, D. Barnes, Beitzel, Bromwell, Brooks, Buckel, Carozza, Ebersole, Folden, Frick, Hixson, S. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Kipke, Knotts, Korman, McKay, Proctor, Saab, Szeliga, Vallario, C. Wilson, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to provide identity protection and credit monitoring services for at least 5 years for current and former students whose personal information has been compromised by a breach of a public school's or a local school system's computer network in violation of a specified provision of law; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Identity Protection and Credit Monitoring Services (Student Identity Protection Act)
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-302 )
(   2-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM