Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of Meetings
Sponsored by
Delegates Szeliga, Afzali, Arentz, Aumann, Buckel, Cassilly, Folden, Grammer, Hornberger, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, McComas, McConkey, McKay, Miele, Morgan, Otto, Parrott, Reilly, Rose, Shoemaker, Vogt, and Corderman
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the General Assembly to make available to the public live and archived video streaming of each meeting of the Senate, the House, and certain standing committees, including any hearings held by certain standing committees.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0933 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of Meetings
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of Meetings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/19 at 3:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 2/26 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-101, 2-1805 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM