Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and Restitution
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Tarlau, Walker, and A. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Information Technology to analyze the logistics of intercepting horse racing winnings to pay for child support or restitution arears, study the use of specified intercept methods by the State for child support enforcement and restitution collection, and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Department to report its finding and recommendations to the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0372
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {105666/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable with Amendments {105666/1 Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 60
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 58
Senate 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 64
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM