Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - County Boards of Education - County Superintendent Contracts
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Miller, Afzali, Atterbeary, Ebersole, Fennell, Lam, Sanchez, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain contract of a county superintendent of schools or a certain chief executive officer, executed on or after June 1, 2019, to include a provision that if the contract is terminated, the maximum cash settlement may not exceed certain amounts; prohibiting a certain cash settlement from including any compensation other than cash, subject to a certain exception; prohibiting a county superintendent or chief executive officer who is removed under certain circumstances from being compensated in a certain manner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - County Boards of Education - County Superintendent Contracts
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-201, 4-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM