Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Nursing Homes and Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Assessment and Safety Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Hucker, Barkley, Barnes, Carr, Clagett, Donoghue, Frick, Glenn, Gutierrez, Jameson, A. Kelly, Kramer, Lafferty, Lee, Luedtke, McHale, A. Miller, Murphy, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, V. Turner, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, and Zucker
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified nursing homes to assign to an appropriate committee the task of conducting an annual assessment of workplace safety issues and making recommendations; requiring the committee to consult specified employees of the nursing home; requiring a specified health care facility to establish a workplace safety committee; requiring a workplace safety committee to establish a workplace safety program including specified components; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0483
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Reassigned to Economic Matters
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {933698/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/5 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-0)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Reassigned to Economic Matters 23
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments {933698/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Special Order until 3/5 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 40
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
House 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (128-0) 43A
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 First Reading Finance 42
Senate 3/14/2014 3/14/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-1410.2 )
(   5-1101 through 5-1103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM