Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Notice and Fees
Sponsored by
Delegates Carey and Lisanti
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 676
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a consumer reporting agency from charging a fee for the placement of a security freeze requested by a consumer or a certain consumer representative; prohibiting a consumer reporting agency from charging a fee for the temporary lift or removal of a security freeze that has been placed on the consumer's credit report; and altering the contents of a certain notice that must be included with a certain summary of rights provided to a consumer.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0202
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Notice and Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {633598/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Notice and Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (108-28)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 676
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Notice and Fees
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments {633598/1 Adopted 41
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Notice and Fees
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (108-28) 42
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Finance 43
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 676
Text - Chapter - Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Notice and Fees
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-1212.1, 14-1212.2, 14-1212.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM