Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Prohibition Against Continued Detention
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Carter, Anderson, Clippinger, Lee, B. Robinson, Valentino-Smith, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the continued detention, beyond emergency detention, of a child under the age of 14, unless the child is alleged to have committed an act that, if committed by an adult, would be punishable by death or life imprisonment.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0732
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0978 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2013 2/04/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM