Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County - Eminent Domain - "Quick Take" Authority
Sponsored by
Charles County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to authorize the governing body of Charles County to provide for the immediate taking of private property situated in the County for right of way for County roads, streets, water, sewer, stormwater management, or drainage under specified circumstances; prohibiting the immediate taking of private property situated in the County if the property includes a building or buildings; and submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State of Maryland for their adoption or rejection.
Committees
Details
Constitutional Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on enactment of a constitutional amendment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM