Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Foreclosures - Baltimore County - Certificate of Vacancy or Certificate of Property Unfit for Human Habitation
Sponsored by
Baltimore County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring Baltimore County to issue on request of a secured party a certificate of vacancy or a certificate of property unfit for human habitation for purposes of filing an order to docket or complaint to foreclose on residential property; and requiring that a certificate be issued or denied in Baltimore County within 14 days after the date of the request for the certificate.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2017
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {900718/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-3)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {900718/1 Report Adopted 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-3) 57
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 56
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105.11 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM