Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Tax Incidence Study - Scope and Intergovernmental Assistance
Sponsored by
Delegate D. Jones
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (117-11)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the scope of certain tax incidence studies submitted by the Bureau of Revenue Estimates; requiring certain governmental units involved in the implementation or administration of taxes and charges evaluated in the study to provide promptly to the Bureau any information requested by the Bureau and otherwise cooperate with the Bureau in order to assist the Bureau in preparing certain tax incidence studies; and applying the Act to studies submitted after September 30, 2021.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0591
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Tax Incidence Study - Scope
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {315869/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-11)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Text - First - Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Tax Incidence Study - Scope
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {315869/1 Adopted 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Tax Incidence Study - Scope and Intergovernmental Assistance
House 3/05/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (117-11) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 2:01 PM
Click to return on the top page