Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Special Education - Learning Continuity Plan - Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegate Guyton
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an individualized education program to include a learning continuity plan to be implemented for students with disabilities during emergency conditions beginning October 1, 2021; requiring an individualized education program team to develop a learning continuity plan at certain times and to consider certain risks for a certain purpose; providing for the contents of a learning continuity plan; authorizing a local school system to provide certain services by certain learning models; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0300
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Special Education - Learning Continuity Plan - Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Special Education - Learning Continuity Plan - Requirement
House 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 4:34 PM
Click to return on the top page