Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transport
Sponsored by
Delegates Williams, Rogers, Bartlett, Chang, Healey, Valentino-Smith, and Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State and certain units and instrumentalities of the State from using any appropriation for a magnetic levitation transportation system in the State; prohibiting a public or private entity that receives money from the State from authorizing a permit or giving any other form of approval for a magnetic levitation transportation system in the State; and prohibiting a proposal for a magnetic levitation transportation system from using a certain right-of-way or track owned or operated by certain railroad companies.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0253
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1296 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transport
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transport
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/26/2020 11:58 AM