Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Protection of Information - Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act)
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Information Technology)
Status
In the House - House Requests Senate Recede
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain units of State government to comply with certain standards and guidelines to ensure that the security of all information systems and applications is managed through a certain framework; establishing that certain provisions of law do not apply to the Office of the Attorney General or the University System of Maryland; requiring certain units to provide an individual with certain means to access certain information and certain third parties; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {376384/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {204732/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Government - Protection of Information - Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act)
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {376384/1 Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - State Government - Protection of Information - Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act)
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Rules 48
Senate 3/26/2019 3/27/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable with Amendments {204732/1 Adopted 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Requests Senate Recede 68
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-1301 through 10-1304, 10-1302, 10-1305, 10-13A-01 through 10-13A-08 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM