Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemptions - Girl Scouts and Boy Scouts
Sponsored by
Delegates Malone, Adams, Afzali, Arentz, Atterbeary, Aumann, Barron, Beidle, Buckel, Carey, Carter, Chang, Ciliberti, Conaway, Dumais, Folden, Ghrist, Glass, Grammer, Hornberger, S. Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Lisanti, Long, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, Moon, Morgan, Parrott, Pena-Melnyk, Reilly, Rey, Saab, Sanchez, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Smith, Sophocleus, Szeliga, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Vogt, West, B. Wilson, and C. Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting from the sales and use tax a sale by a chartered organization of the Boy Scouts of America or a scout unit chartered by a local council of the Boy Scouts of America in the State, or by a troop of the Girl Scouts of the USA.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0522
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
(   11-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page