Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Life Imprisonment - Parole Eligibility
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Buckel, Chisholm, Clark, Corderman, Grammer, Krebs, Malone, Mangione, McComas, Morgan, Reilly, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that certain inmates sentenced to life imprisonment for a crime committed on or after October 1, 2019 are not eligible for parole consideration until having served 25 years without application of diminution of confinement credits; requiring that a certain decision by the Maryland Parole Commission regarding parole of a certain inmate be transmitted to the Governor; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0874
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Crimes - Life Imprisonment - Parole Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Crimes - Life Imprisonment - Parole Eligibility
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM