Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
**Veto override
   HB0720 - 2019RS
   CH0005 - 2020RS
Title
Natural Resources - Fishery Management Plans - Oysters
Sponsored by
Delegates Barve, Busch, and Stein
Status
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 5 of 2020
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to convene the Oyster Advisory Commission, in coordination with the University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science, on or before June 1, 2019; requiring the Department, in coordination with the University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science and the Commission, to develop a package of consensus recommendations regarding the fishery management plan for oysters; requiring the Commission to develop certain recommendations to achieve certain oyster management goals; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0830
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Fishery Management Plans - Oysters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {530016/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Adams) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {173429/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (40-89)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Fishery Management Plans - Oysters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-39)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {724639/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-13)
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-39)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Natural Resources - Fishery Management Plans - Oysters
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/21 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/30 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Veto overridden (95-43)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Veto overridden (31-15)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 5 of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Natural Resources - Fishery Management Plans - Oysters
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {530016/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Adams) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {173429/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (40-89) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Fishery Management Plans - Oysters
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (96-39) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {724639/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (32-13) 59AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (99-39) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Natural Resources - Fishery Management Plans - Oysters
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/21 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/30 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Veto overridden (95-43)
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Veto overridden (31-15)
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 5 of 2020
(   4-204, 4-215 )
Last Updated: 2/12/2020 11:33 AM
Click to return on the top page